CO SB085 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the sexual misconduct advisory committee, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations in the 2022 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Continue Sexual Misconduct Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-085 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-085 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-085 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-085 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |