CO SB083 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of obsolete provisions regarding air quality control, and, in connection therewith, eliminating the requirement that the state board of health supervise certain air quality control programs and removing statutory provisions relating to the air pollution variance board and the air quality hearings board.
Title
Colorado Department Of Public Health And Environment Air Quality Control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 19-083 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-083 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 19-083 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-083 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |