CO SB081 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the repeal of the "Colorado Cancer Drug Repository Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Cancer Drug Repository Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-081 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-081 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Governor Signed
2019-03-05 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
2019-01-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-081
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_081_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_081_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_081_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_081_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_081_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_081_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2e348f375b28f3798725838b0073a2cb-sb19-081-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-081vote5a5f5a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f704ea30064be278872583a90062e3b2-sb19-081-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-081vote59b6d7

Bill Comments

feedback