CO SB070 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Discrimination Labor Union Participation
Title
Prohibit Discrimination Labor Union Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-070 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-070 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-070 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-070 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-070 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-070 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-070 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/19/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |