CO SB060 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consumer protections in event ticket sales.
Title
Consumer Protection In Event Ticketing Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 23-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.033 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.032 (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.031 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.030 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 23-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.033 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.032 (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.031 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.030 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2023-05-06 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2023-05-03 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2023-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/7/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/03/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |