CO SB059 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reorganization of the juvenile justice code in article 2 of title 19, Colorado Revised Statutes, by the Colorado juvenile justice and delinquency prevention council as authorized by House Joint Resolution 18-1013.
Title
Juvenile Justice Code Reorganization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |