CO SB058 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Committee on Economic and Business Development Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Committee on Economic and Business Development Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Venture Capital Advisory Board
Title
Venture Capital Advisory Board
Sponsors
Sen. Stratton Heath [D] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 12-058 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 12-058 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 12-058 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-058 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |