CO SB043 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Repeal Office Child Rep
Title
Extend Repeal Office Child Rep
Sponsors
Rep. John Pommer [D] | Sen. Al White [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-043 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-05 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-01-20 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |