CO SB042 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the Arie P. Taylor sickle cell disease outreach program to provide support to individuals living with sickle cell disease, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Sickle Cell Disease Community Outreach & Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |