CO SB042 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

concerning the treatment of persons with behavioral health disorders in the criminal and juvenile justice systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Committee Treatment Persons In Criminal And Juvenile Justice Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26 Governor Signed
2020-06-19 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-05-26HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-03-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
2020-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-03SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-042
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_042_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_042_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_042_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_042_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_042_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_042_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/66e3eedc95441c1f87258503007abddb-sb20-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/66e3eedc95441c1f87258503007abddb-sb20-042-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b3a8e54f281ee7b8725852300535b10-sb20-042-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b3a8e54f281ee7b8725852300535b10-sb20-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-042vote54da60
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a471b3160156c13387258574006d89d4-sb20-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cfa57f610a21d80e8725857c00625829-sb20-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-042vote5dcce2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-042vote5e1e3c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-042vote5e0811
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a471b3160156c13387258574006d89d4-sb20-042-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback