CO SB041 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Regulation Amateur Radio Antennas
Title
Local Government Regulation Amateur Radio Antennas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-041 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |