CO SB039 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-6)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the elimination of subminimum wage employment by providing supports to ensure successful transitions for individuals currently working in subminimum wage jobs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elimination Of Subminimum Wage Employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29 Governor Signed
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-05-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-25HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-21HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
2021-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-039
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_039_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_039_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_039_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_039_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_039_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_039_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB039_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB039_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB039_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB039_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb039_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0039_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb039_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0039_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb039_r2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b6db6fe3e8bebe88725868d0070eb61-sb21-039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b6db6fe3e8bebe88725868d0070eb61-sb21-039-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e040e505e8451839872586c0004dff9d-sb21-039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-039vote5a929b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e040e505e8451839872586c0004dff9d-sb21-039-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64c6144d06bc340e872586cb00718c08-sb21-039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64c6144d06bc340e872586cb00718c08-sb21-039-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f400aa14afbaf5bb872586dc004c2ca6-sb21-039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-039vote76d4e9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-039vote701f44

Bill Comments

feedback