CO SB034 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing access to school-based health care.
Title
Increase Access to School-Based Health Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |