CO SB033 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of statutory changes related to conservation easements that were recommended by the conservation easement working group convened in accordance with House Bill 19-1264, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Conservation Easement Working Group Proposals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-033 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-033 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-033, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2021-06-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-06-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |