CO SB033 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access to the medicaid buy-in program for certain working adults with disabilities who have become ineligible for the program due to age, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Allow Medicaid Buy-in Program After Age 65
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-033 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-033 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-033 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-033 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-033 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-033 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-033, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/08/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |