CO SB024 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning permitting a challenge to the constitutionality of a court order in a contempt proceeding.
Title
First Amendment Collateral Challenge Court Order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 23-024 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 23-024 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 23-024 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2023-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |