CO SB023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting deceptive tactics during custodial interrogation of a juvenile.
Title
Deceptive Tactics Juvenile Custodian Interrogation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment L) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment J) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment L) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment J) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-023, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |