CO SB022 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Development Financial Institutions
Title
Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |