CO SB017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that the high-performance transportation enterprise include information about its public-private partnerships in its annual report to the legislative committees of the house of representatives and the senate that have jurisdiction over transportation.
Title
Transportation Public-private Partnership Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Faith Winter [D] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/02/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/25/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |