CO SB016 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/08/2014 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/08/2014 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
CDPHE Regulate Freestanding Emergency Centers
Title
CDPHE Regulate Freestanding Emergency Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Amendment J) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Amendment J) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Amendment J) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Amendment J) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/08/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/31/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 3/21/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/14/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/10/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |