CO SB013 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-14)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-14)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the compensation of attorneys working in the office of a district attorney.
Title
District Attorneys' Salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |