CO SB013 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the conditions for medical marijuana use for disabling medical conditions, and, in connection therewith, adding a condition for which a physician could prescribe an opioid to the list of disabling medical conditions for medical marijuana use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana Condition Opiates Prescribed For

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-013
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_013_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_013_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_013_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_013_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_013_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_013_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2371208360169ba787258399006ca7da-sb19-013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-013vote59f3fd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2371208360169ba787258399006ca7da-sb19-013-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6726e17fff8dd0a872583e6006f1374-sb19-013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-013vote57d37a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-013vote709aaf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-013vote70a831
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-013vote74abc4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6726e17fff8dd0a872583e6006f1374-sb19-013-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6726e17fff8dd0a872583e6006f1374-sb19-013-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback