CO SB013 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the conditions for medical marijuana use for disabling medical conditions, and, in connection therewith, adding a condition for which a physician could prescribe an opioid to the list of disabling medical conditions for medical marijuana use.
Title
Medical Marijuana Condition Opiates Prescribed For
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |