CO SB012 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Colorado Works Pass-through Child Support Payment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Works Pass-through Child Support Payment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J3 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer sb 12, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-012 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-012 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Includes J001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-012, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 3-2. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-012, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 3-2. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-08SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-08SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
2015-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-15HouseSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2015-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-14SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-10SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-10SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-01-22SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2015-01-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012shhsfin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012shhsfinapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012app_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/61D8E80EEB1B062F87257D900078252A/$FILE/012_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D20A4C2B7139E8FE87257DD5007D546F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7F584F1D2100C54B87257DD5007D1853
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D20A4C2B7139E8FE87257DD5007D546F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7F584F1D2100C54B87257DD5007D1853
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1FE3B85280767A3C87257DE8007AAB9E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/54EFCDC67117EC5187257DE8007AA567
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/88B678FCDCA4EEF787257E23004ACC2C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3AC0F36121E6455887257E23004ADDC2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FBC41CBD0317423987257E3100764302
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FBC41CBD0317423987257E3100764302
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FC225C528609AB1F87257E380078B2AF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3650CFDB6DE981B187257E380078A6D5

Bill Comments

feedback