CO SB010 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning pretrial diversion programs that are intended to identify eligible individuals who have behavioral health disorders in order to divert them from the criminal justice system into community treatment programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pretrial Diversion For Person With Behavioral Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-010, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-010 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-010, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-010, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-02 Governor Signed
2022-04-21 Sent to the Governor
2022-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2022-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-04-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2022-04-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-04-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2022-04-06HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2022-03-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2022-03-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-03-18SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2022-03-18SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2022-02-03SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2022-01-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb22-010
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_010_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_010_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_010_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_010_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_010_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_010_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB010_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB010_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB010_L.005.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb010_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb0010_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb010_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1b69fe447dd0b296872587de007fd550-sb22-010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1b69fe447dd0b296872587de007fd550-sb22-010-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1b69fe447dd0b296872587de007fd550-sb22-010-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/957372d28f63722687258809005087b3-sb22-010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-010vote5ace47
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e5f2592a06f2500e8725881c007ca9d6-sb22-010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-010vote547b93
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-010vote5a5a30
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-010vote5a685f

Bill Comments

feedback