CO SB006 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning considering factors related to the capability to participate in the judicial process in determining whether to place a person into a pretrial diversion program.
Title
Pretrial Diversion Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-006 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2024-03-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/24 - No Amendments |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/08/24 - No Amendments |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |