CO SB004 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning concurrent legislative jurisdiction over real property constituting the United States Army Pueblo chemical depot.
Title
Jurisdiction Over Pueblo Chemical Depot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |