CO SB003 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning assistance for individuals who are unable to pay their energy utility bills, and, in connection therewith, transferring money from the general fund to the energy outreach Colorado low-income energy assistance fund.
Title
Money For Energy Utility Bill Payment Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.004) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.004) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20B-003 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Governor Signed | |
2020-12-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-12-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-12-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-12-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-12-01 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-12-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |