CO SB002 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-18)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning increasing the resources available for fire protection services provided by volunteer and seasonal firefighters, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resources For Volunteer Firefighters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-002, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-03 Governor Signed
2022-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2022-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2022-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-05-04SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2022-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2022-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-04-28HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2022-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2022-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2022-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2022-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2022-04-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
2022-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2022-04-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2022-02-22SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2022-01-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb22-002
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_002_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_002_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_002_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_002_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_002_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_002_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB002_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB002_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB002_J.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB002_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB002_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB002_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/SB002_J.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb002_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb002_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb0002_sn2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb002_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_sb0002_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d56b076dfca9fd6872587f10074e50a-sb22-002-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d56b076dfca9fd6872587f10074e50a-sb22-002-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d56b076dfca9fd6872587f10074e50a-sb22-002-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bfdb25a0f6a0a4d68725881700505b49-sb22-002-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bfdb25a0f6a0a4d68725881700505b49-sb22-002-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bfdb25a0f6a0a4d68725881700505b49-sb22-002-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-002vote55ad13
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b366e417d9e7ed5087258829006cae23-sb22-002-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b366e417d9e7ed5087258829006cae23-sb22-002-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1586f2748ae5abfc87258830004fb2cc-sb22-002-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1586f2748ae5abfc87258830004fb2cc-sb22-002-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1586f2748ae5abfc87258830004fb2cc-sb22-002-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-002vote58b403
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-002vote756c9a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb22-002vote757ea4

Bill Comments

feedback