CO SB001 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
College Affordability Act
Title
College Affordability Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-21 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |