CO HR1009 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the awareness of meningococcal disease.
Title
Meningococcal Disease Awareness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |