CO HM1001 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial Representative Nick Theos
Title
Memorial Representative Nick Theos
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-01-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-10 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 01/15/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |