CO HJR1018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning honoring Gold Star Families.
Title
Honoring Gold Star Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2018-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |