CO HJR1004 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of United States Highway 6 in Eagle County from Mile Marker 139.5 to Mile Marker 134 as the "Lieutenant Eric Hill Memorial Highway".
Title
Designate Lieutenant Eric Hill Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-02-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-01-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |