CO HJR1004 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding for the prevention of aquatic nuisance species in Colorado.
Title
Funding Prevent Aquatic Nuisance Species
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer HJR17-1004 to the Full House of Representatives. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer HJR17-1004 to the Full House of Representatives. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2017-01-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-01-23 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |