CO HB1465 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes related to programs funded with money the state received from the federal coronavirus state fiscal recovery fund, and, in connection therewith, changing appropriations.
Title
Program Changes Refinance Coronavirus Recovery Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1465, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1465 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1465, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1465 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |