CO HB1430 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
New K-12 Ed Assessment System
Title
New K-12 Ed Assessment System
Sponsors
Sen. Evie Hudak [D] | Rep. Judy Solano [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1430, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1430, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1430, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere | |
2010-05-12 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-12 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | |
2010-05-12 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Adhere | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2010-05-06 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-05 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |