CO HB1417 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pay Equity Commission
Title
Pay Equity Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reconsider House Bill 10-1417 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1417 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1417, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1417 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1417, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2010-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |