CO HB1410 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to address prison population increases.
Title
Prison Population Management Measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1410 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1410, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1410 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1410, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |