CO HB1407 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Range Worker Advisory Council
Title
Range Worker Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 10-1407 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1407, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1407, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-30 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-04-15 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations |