CO HB1406 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the augmentation of the general fund through transfers of certain money.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cash Fund Transfers To The General Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1406, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1406 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1406, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-26 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-13SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-11SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2020-06-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-04HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1406
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1406_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1406_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1406_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1406_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1406_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1406_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0775a5196dafbcaf8725857d007bded0-hb20-1406-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/44b4952b7b573eaa872585810053ca74-hb20-1406-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1406vote548b1c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/063717d4f1cf980487258584007b79cb-hb20-1406-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/063717d4f1cf980487258584007b79cb-hb20-1406-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/063717d4f1cf980487258584007b79cb-hb20-1406-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1406vote593f91
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1406vote590c15
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1406vote5cbe9f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1406vote5ca6c9

Bill Comments

feedback