CO HB1383 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-06 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-06 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Child Welfare Predictive Analytic Pilot Program
Title
Child Welfare Predictive Analytic Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1383, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2016-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-19 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |