CO HB1366 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement to include measurable goals that are subject to deadlines in Colorado's climate action plan.
Title
Measurable Goals Deadlines Colorado Climate Action Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1366 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1366 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1366 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1366 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1366 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |