CO HB1366 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibitions On Circulating Petitions
Title
Prohibitions On Circulating Petitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 10-1366 indefinitely and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1366 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1366, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1366, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1366 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1366, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1366, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Education Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology + Finance | |
2010-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-03 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-30 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-06 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance | |
2010-03-17 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance + Appropriations |