CO HB1358 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 2:00 pm in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 2:00 pm in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the film incentive income tax credit, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Film Incentive Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1358, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1358 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1358, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1358 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |