CO HB1356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adding a nonsubstantive cross reference to the crime of failure to register as a sex offender.
Title
Add Cross Reference to Failure To Register Crime
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1356 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1356 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1356 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1356 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |