CO HB1350 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room LSB-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room LSB-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning standards related to court proceedings for allocation of parental responsibilities to keep children safe.
Title
Parental Responsibilities Proceedings Child Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1350, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1350, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1350, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1350, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |