CO HB1346 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale of more than fifteen acres of land at the Colorado mental health institute at Fort Logan to the United States department of veterans affairs for the expansion of Fort Logan national cemetery.
Title
Land Sale To Fort Logan Cemetery
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lontine [D] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1346 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1346 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1346 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: This is a conceptual amendment. Amend printed bill, page 4, line two, after "veterans-related" insert "and behavioral-health related." (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1346, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1346 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1346 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: This is a conceptual amendment. Amend printed bill, page 4, line two, after "veterans-related" insert "and behavioral-health related." (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1346, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |