CO HB1345 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Powers Over Charter Schools
Title
Emergency Powers Over Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1345, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1345, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1345, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-12 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2010-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-29 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-08 | House Committee on Education Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |