CO HB1331 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-8)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-8)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a grant program for eligible nonprofit organizations to provide out-of-school time programs to students, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Out-of-School Time Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1331 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1331 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1331, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1331 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1331 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1331, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |